IN SB0080 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 133
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Code Revision Corrections. Addresses problems in the Indiana Code not suitable for resolution in the annual Technical Corrections bill, including resolution of the conflicts between versions of sections that were both amended and repealed during the 2019 legislative session. Resolves technical conflicts between various enrolled acts passed during the 2020 legislative session. Corrects technical errors in various enrolled acts passed during the 2020 legislative session.
Title
Code Revision Corrections.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Young [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. Greg Taylor [D] |
Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] | Rep. Edward DeLaney [D] |
Rep. Terry Goodin [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 133 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 387: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 382: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-03-11 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-11 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Steuerwald, Boy and Goodin |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Young J and DeLaney |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Freeman and Randolph Lonnie M |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Young M and Taylor G |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 181: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Representatives Torr and DeLaney added as cosponsors |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-10 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Young J |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 17: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Taylor G |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senators Young M, Freeman, Breaux |