IN SB0083 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 28 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Various property tax matters. Provides that an individual who is certified as a level one or level two assessor-appraiser, may serve as a tax representative of a taxpayer before the county property tax assessment board of appeals, if authorized by the taxpayer on a form submitted with the taxpayer's notice to initiate an appeal. Provides that an individual who is certified as a level three assessor-appraiser may serve as a tax representative of a taxpayer before the county property tax assessment board of appeals or the Indiana board. Provides that, if the date 30 days after the due date for delinquent real and personal property taxes falls on a Saturday, a Sunday, or a holiday, payment of the delinquent taxes made on the next succeeding day that is not a Saturday, Sunday, or holiday is subject only to a 5% penalty rather than a 10% penalty.
Title
Various property tax matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-09 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Aylesworth |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 57: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Niemeyer) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |