IN SB0097 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Insurance drug coverage. Prohibits a state employee health plan, a policy of accident and sickness insurance, or a health maintenance organization from modifying an enrollee's coverage of a drug during the current plan year. Specifies prohibited modifications. Provides for certain exceptions. (The introduced version of this bill was prepared by the interim study committee on public health, behavioral health, and human services.)
Title
Insurance drug coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Charbonneau |