IN SB0099 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Public Law 147
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wage assignments for clothing and tools. Provides that a wage assignment may be made for the rental of uniform shirts, pants, and job-related clothing. Provides that a wage assignment may be made for the purchase of equipment or tools necessary to fulfill the duties of employment. Provides that an employee shall not be charged or subject to a wage assignment for personal protective equipment except for those instances provided under federal rules. Provides that the total amount of wages subject to assignment for the purchase of uniforms and equipment or rental of uniform shirts, pants and job-related clothing may not exceed certain amounts. Legalizes deductions made before the passage of the bill by an employer from the wages of an employee for the rental of uniforms, shirts, pants, or other job-related clothing.
Title
Wage assignments for clothing and tools. Provides that a wage assignment may be made for the rental of uniform shirts, pants, and job-related clothing. Provides that a wage assignment may be made for the purchase of equipment or tools necessary to fulfill the duties of employment. Provides that an employee shall not be charged or subject to a wage assignment for personal protective equipment except for those instances provided under federal rules. Provides that the total amount of wages subject to assignment for the purchase of uniforms and equipment or rental of uniform shirts, pants and job-related clothing may not exceed certain amounts. Legalizes deductions made before the passage of the bill by an employer from the wages of an employee for the rental of uniforms, shirts, pants, or other job-related clothing.
Sponsors
Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Greg Walker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] |
Rep. Doug Gutwein [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-03-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Senate | Public Law 147 |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 557: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-04-23 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 590: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2019-04-22 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2019-04-22 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2019-04-15 | House | House advisors appointed: Jordan, Goodrich, Bartlett, Deal and Moseley |
2019-04-15 | House | House conferees appointed: VanNatter and Beck |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Walker and Tallian |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Boots and Niezgodski |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-03-27 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-03-26 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 349: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2019-03-21 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-19 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-12 | House | Representative Carbaugh added as cosponsor |
2019-03-05 | House | Representative Jordan added as cosponsor |
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Gutwein |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative VanNatter |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Walker added as second author |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Boots |