IN SB0101 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Wrongful death damages. Increases the aggregate damages cap for a wrongful death action from $300,000 to $700,000.
Title
Wrongful death damages.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Gregory Steuerwald [R] |
Rep. John Young [R] | Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Chris May [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 31 N: 18 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Young J, Eberhart, May |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 67: yeas 31, nays 18 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bohacek |