IN SB0104 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-26 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 211: yeas 22, nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Small loans. Changes the current incremental finance charge limits that apply to a small loan to a maximum annual rate. Prohibits making, or taking other actions with respect to, a small loan with a greater rate or amount of interest, or other fees and charges, than allowed under the statute governing small loans. Prohibits a credit services organization from providing certain functions with respect to a small loan and makes a violation a deceptive act.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Small loans. Changes the current incremental finance charge limits that apply to a small loan to a maximum annual rate. Prohibits making, or taking other actions with respect to, a small loan with a greater rate or amount of interest, or other fees and charges, than allowed under the statute governing small loans. Prohibits a credit services organization from providing certain functions with respect to a small loan and makes a violation a deceptive act.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 22 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-26SenateThird reading: defeated; Roll Call 211: yeas 22, nays 27
2019-02-25SenateSenator Randolph added as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as second author
2019-02-25SenateSenator Ruckelshaus removed as coauthor
2019-02-25SenateSecond reading: ordered engrossed
2019-02-21SenateSenator Bohacek added as coauthor
2019-02-21SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2019-02-19SenateSenator Messmer removed as second author
2019-02-07SenateSenator Ford J.D. added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Stoops added as coauthor
2019-01-24SenateSenator Breaux added as coauthor
2019-01-14SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
2019-01-03SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions
2019-01-03SenateCoauthored by Senators Tomes, Becker and Kruse
2019-01-03SenateAuthored by Senators Walker and Messmer

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback