IN SB0142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on March 13 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-13 - Public Law 48
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Maternal mortality review committee. Requires the state department of health (state department) to establish a statewide maternal mortality review committee (committee) until June 30, 2023, and sets forth membership and duties of the committee. Specifies confidentiality of records reviewed by the committee. Requires a health care provider or health care facility that has a patient who dies of a maternal mortality to report the death to the committee and sets forth immunity provisions for the provider or facility. Allows the committee to review maternal morbidity cases. Specifies records to which the committee may have access. Requires the committee to submit
Title
Maternal mortality review committee. Requires the state department of health (state department) to establish a statewide maternal mortality review committee (committee) until June 30, 2023, and sets forth membership and duties of the committee. Specifies confidentiality of records reviewed by the committee. Requires a health care provider or health care facility that has a patient who dies of a maternal mortality to report the death to the committee and sets forth immunity provisions for the provider or facility. Allows the committee to review maternal morbidity cases. Specifies records to which the committee may have access. Requires the committee to submit
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-14 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-10 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-13 | Senate | Public Law 48 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-08 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 277: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-21 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 194: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2018-02-19 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Brown, C. added as cosponsor |
2018-02-15 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | Representative Olthoff added as cosponsor |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2018-01-19 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Alting added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2018-01-18 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Engleman |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 25: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Charbonneau) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senator Becker added as third author |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leising |