IN SB0178 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Property tax exemption. Provides that a person seeking a property tax exemption for property used for a charitable purpose may file an exemption application up to 30 days after the statutory deadline if the person pays a late filing fee. Requires the county auditor deposit all money collected from the late filing fee in the county's property reassessment fund. Provides that a property owner may submit a property tax exemption application before September 1, 2019, for any real and personal property: (1) for which an exemption application was filed after April 1, 2017, and before April 10, 2017; and (2) that would have been eligible for a property tax exemption if an exemption application had been properly and timely filed for the real and personal property. Specifies that if a property owner files such an exemption application, the property tax exemption shall be allowed and granted for the January 1, 2017, assessment date, and the property owner is entitled to a refund for any taxes, penalties, and interest paid with respect to the property for that assessment date.
Title
Property tax exemption. Provides that a person seeking a property tax exemption for property used for a charitable purpose may file an exemption application up to 30 days after the statutory deadline if the person pays a late filing fee. Requires the county auditor deposit all money collected from the late filing fee in the county's property reassessment fund. Provides that a property owner may submit a property tax exemption application before September 1, 2019, for any real and personal property: (1) for which an exemption application was filed after April 1, 2017, and before April 10, 2017; and (2) that would have been eligible for a property tax exemption if an exemption application had been properly and timely filed for the real and personal property. Specifies that if a property owner files such an exemption application, the property tax exemption shall be allowed and granted for the January 1, 2017, assessment date, and the property owner is entitled to a refund for any taxes, penalties, and interest paid with respect to the property for that assessment date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronnie Alting [R] | Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Sharon Negele [R] | Rep. Donald Lehe [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] | Rep. Sheila Klinker [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Lehe, Brown, T. and Klinker |
2019-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Negele |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 28: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Holdman) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alting |