IN SB0179 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-28 - First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Specifies that a county executive may not submit an application for federal grant funds or grants payable from federal funds allocated to the state unless the application is first approved by resolution of the county council. Provides that this requirement does not apply to Marion County.
Title
Applications for federal grants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Reread third time: passed (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-28 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-02-10 | Cosponsors: Reps. R. Frye and Knollman | |
2011-02-10 | House sponsor: Rep. McMillin | |
2011-02-10 | Referred to the House | |
2011-02-10 | Reread third time: passed; Roll Call 96: yeas 41, nays 8 | |
2011-02-07 | Amendment 1 (Leising), prevailed; | |
2011-02-07 | Reread second time: amended and ordered engrossed | |
2011-02-03 | Senator Lawson added as second author | |
2011-02-03 | Placed back on second reading | |
2011-02-03 | Third reading: call withdrawn | |
2011-01-31 | Senator R. Young added as coauthor | |
2011-01-31 | Senator Randolph added as coauthor | |
2011-01-31 | Second reading: ordered engrossed | |
2011-01-27 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2011-01-05 | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government | |
2011-01-05 | Authored by Senator Leising |