IN SB0183 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Study committee review of food and beverage taxes. Requires each political subdivision or other entity that imposes a food and beverage tax to annually report information concerning distributions and expenditures of amounts received from the food and beverage tax. Urges the legislative council to assign to the fiscal policy interim study committee the task of conducting a review of each food and beverage tax statute, including: (1) the purposes for which revenue from each food and beverage tax may be used; and (2) the expiration date of each food and beverage tax, if any.
Title
Study committee review of food and beverage taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Rep. Anthony Cook [R] | Rep. Chuck Goodrich [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Goodrich |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cook |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 141: yeas 44, nays 5 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Koch added as third author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Gaskill) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Gaskill |