IN SB0186 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-21 - Public Law 158
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Online continuing education for auctioneers. Provides that the auctioneer commission may approve online instruction courses and continuing education courses offered by course providers approved by the auctioneer commission.
Title
Online continuing education for auctioneers. Provides that the auctioneer commission may approve online instruction courses and continuing education courses offered by course providers approved by the auctioneer commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] |
Rep. Philip GiaQuinta [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-14 - Senate - Senate - Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-13 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 158 |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-20 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-14 | Senate | Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 382: yeas 45, nays 0 |
2018-03-13 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 382: yeas 97, nays 0 |
2018-03-13 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2018-03-05 | House | Representative Torr added as advisor |
2018-03-05 | House | House advisors appointed: Burton and Taylor J |
2018-03-05 | House | House conferees appointed: Morris and GiaQuinta |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Raatz and Stoops |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Kruse and Randolph Lonnie M |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2018-02-20 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-19 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 182: yeas 96, nays 1 |
2018-02-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Burton and GiaQuinta |
2018-01-22 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Morris |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 34: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Kruse |