IN SB0187 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 7
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Elkhart County courts. Provides that the board of county commissioners shall provide the circuit court clerk with an office at: (1) the county seat; or (2) in Elkhart County, any other place in the county as the board of county commissioners may provide; in a building provided for that purpose. Provides that each division of the circuit court or superior court of Elkhart County shall hold sessions at: (1) the courthouse of the county; or (2) any other place in the county as the board of county commissioners may provide.
Title
Elkhart County courts.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Ryan Mishler [R] | Sen. Linda Rogers [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Rep. Doug Miller [R] | Rep. Christy Stutzman [R] | Rep. Timothy Wesco [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 7 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 187: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Wesco added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-15 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Stutzman |
2020-01-14 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Miller D |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 18: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |