IN SB0190 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 6 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation
Pending: House Roads and Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Modified symbol of access. Requires that parking signs for accessible parking spaces for an individual with a physical disability must bear, instead of the international symbol of accessibility (also known as the international wheelchair symbol), the modified symbol of access when erected, replaced, or repaired after December 31, 2019. Requires that license plates and placards issued by the bureau of motor vehicles for display in or on a vehicle used to transport a person with a disability must bear, rather than the international symbol of accessibility, the modified symbol of access on all new license plates or duplicate or replacement plates after December 31, 2019.
Title
Modified symbol of access. Requires that parking signs for accessible parking spaces for an individual with a physical disability must bear, instead of the international symbol of accessibility (also known as the international wheelchair symbol), the modified symbol of access when erected, replaced, or repaired after December 31, 2019. Requires that license plates and placards issued by the bureau of motor vehicles for display in or on a vehicle used to transport a person with a disability must bear, rather than the international symbol of accessibility, the modified symbol of access on all new license plates or duplicate or replacement plates after December 31, 2019.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-05 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as third author |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Candelaria Reardon, Frye and Sullivan |
2019-02-05 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 78: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Ruckelshaus |