IN SB0203 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 17-1)
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 203
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes resulting in the loss of a fetus. Provides that the crimes of: (1) murder; (2) voluntary manslaughter; (3) involuntary manslaughter; and (4) feticide; may be committed against a fetus in any stage of development. Specifies that the offenses do not apply to a: (1) lawfully performed abortion; or (2) pregnant woman with respect to a fetus carried by the woman. Provides, with certain exceptions, that a person who commits a felony that causes the termination of a pregnancy may receive an additional sentence of six to 20 years.
Title
Crimes resulting in the loss of a fetus. Provides that the crimes of: (1) murder; (2) voluntary manslaughter; (3) involuntary manslaughter; and (4) feticide; may be committed against a fetus in any stage of development. Specifies that the offenses do not apply to a: (1) lawfully performed abortion; or (2) pregnant woman with respect to a fetus carried by the woman. Provides, with certain exceptions, that a person who commits a felony that causes the termination of a pregnancy may receive an additional sentence of six to 20 years.
Sponsors
Sen. Aaron Freeman [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. John Crane [R] |
Sen. Jean Leising [R] | Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. Michael Young [R] |
Sen. Michael Delph [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Rep. Mike Speedy [R] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] | Rep. Jack Jordan [R] |
Rep. Wendy McNamara [R] | Rep. Justin Moed [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-21 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 42 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 203 |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 340: yeas 41, nays 8 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-27 | House | Representative Moed added as cosponsor |
2018-02-27 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2018-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 233: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2018-02-26 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-22 | House | Representative McNamara added as cosponsor |
2018-02-22 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-15 | House | Representative Jordan added as cosponsor |
2018-02-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2018-02-06 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-02-05 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as coauthor |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Bacon |
2018-02-01 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Speedy |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 118: yeas 42, nays 6 |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Holdman added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senator Delph added as coauthor |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Freeman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Freeman) motion withdrawn |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Second reading: call withdrawn |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Senator Young M added as coauthor |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senators Crane, Leising, Sandlin, Tomes added as coauthors |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Koch added as third author |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2018-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2018-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Freeman |