IN SB0203 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 25 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-26 - First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
Pending: House Public Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Physician maintenance of certification. Prohibits a hospital from denying hospital staff or admitting privileges to a physician or podiatrist based solely on the decision of the physician or podiatrist not to participate in maintenance of certification. Specifies that the medical licensing statute and the podiatrist licensing statute do not require a licensed physician or licensed podiatrist to hold or maintain a board certification in a specialty medical area in order to practice. Prohibits an accident and sickness insurer from: (1) denying a physician or podiatrist the right to enter into a reimbursement agreement with the insurer; (2) denying a physician or podiatrist reimbursement for a covered service; or (3) setting reimbursement for services provided by a physician or podiatrist at a lower rate; based solely on the decision of the physician or podiatrist not to participate in maintenance of certification. Prohibits a health maintenance organization (HMO) from: (1) preventing a physician or podiatrist from entering into a participating provider contract with the HMO; (2) denying a physician or podiatrist reimbursement for a covered service; or (3) setting reimbursement for services provided by a physician or podiatrist at a lower rate; based solely on the decision of the physician or podiatrist not to participate in maintenance of certification.
Title
Physician maintenance of certification. Prohibits a hospital from denying hospital staff or admitting privileges to a physician or podiatrist based solely on the decision of the physician or podiatrist not to participate in maintenance of certification. Specifies that the medical licensing statute and the podiatrist licensing statute do not require a licensed physician or licensed podiatrist to hold or maintain a board certification in a specialty medical area in order to practice. Prohibits an accident and sickness insurer from: (1) denying a physician or podiatrist the right to enter into a reimbursement agreement with the insurer; (2) denying a physician or podiatrist reimbursement for a covered service; or (3) setting reimbursement for services provided by a physician or podiatrist at a lower rate; based solely on the decision of the physician or podiatrist not to participate in maintenance of certification. Prohibits a health maintenance organization (HMO) from: (1) preventing a physician or podiatrist from entering into a participating provider contract with the HMO; (2) denying a physician or podiatrist reimbursement for a covered service; or (3) setting reimbursement for services provided by a physician or podiatrist at a lower rate; based solely on the decision of the physician or podiatrist not to participate in maintenance of certification.
Sponsors
Sen. Elizabeth Brown [R] | Sen. Vaneta Becker [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] |
Rep. Dave Heine [R] | Rep. Robert Morris [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-01-24 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 44 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-26 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Morris |
2019-01-24 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Heine |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 31: yeas 44, nays 4 |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senator Becker added as second author |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |