IN SB0205 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical payment coverage. Specifies that medical payment coverage is supplemental to coverage under a health plan, but does not require a health plan to provide greater benefits to an individual with medical payment coverage than an individual without medical payment coverage. Preserves rights of subrogation available under a health plan.
Title
Medical payment coverage.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senators Tomes and Tallian added as coauthors |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Schaibley and Young J |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Heaton |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 75: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as third author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as second author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Messmer |