IN SB0208 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance
Pending: House Insurance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Compliance with coverage parity requirements. Requires an insurer that issues a policy of accident and sickness insurance or a health maintenance organization contract that provides coverage of services for treatment of a mental illness or substance abuse to annually submit a report and analysis to the department of insurance (department) that includes certain information demonstrating its compliance with federal laws regarding parity in coverage of services for treatment of a mental illness or substance abuse and coverage of services for treatment of other medical or surgical conditions, including the processes used: (1) to develop medical necessity criteria for coverage of services; and (2) to develop and apply nonquantitative treatment limitations. Requires an insurer that issues a policy of accident and sickness insurance or a health maintenance organization contract that provides coverage for services for treatment of substance abuse to take certain actions with respect to prescription drugs approved for the treatment of substance abuse. Requires the department to adopt rules to ensure compliance with federal laws regarding parity in coverage. Requires the department to submit before March 1, 2021, a report to the general assembly detailing the steps taken to ensure insurers' compliance with state and federal laws regarding parity in coverage.
Title
Compliance with coverage parity requirements.
Sponsors
Sen. Michael Crider [R] | Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Jean Breaux [D] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] |
Rep. Cindy Kirchhofer [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 145: yeas 47, nays 1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |