IN SB0209 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Search warrants. Provides that a warrant authorizing a search, testing, or other analysis of an item is deemed executed when the item is seized. Provides that a warrant return is sufficient if the return contains a statement indicating that the item was seized by a law enforcement officer.
Title
Search warrants.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 63 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 277: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Steuerwald |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 146: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senators Rogers and Glick added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senators Young M and Bohacek added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Koch added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-06 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |