IN SB0221 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - House advisors appointed: Ziemke and Bartlett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 3 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-16 - House advisors appointed: Ziemke and Bartlett
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Township mergers. Eliminates the requirement that one member of the township board of a merged township must reside within each of the townships that merged.
Title
Township mergers. Eliminates the requirement that one member of the township board of a merged township must reside within each of the townships that merged.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Rick Niemeyer [R] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | House | House advisors appointed: Ziemke and Bartlett |
2019-04-16 | House | House conferees appointed: Lehman and Campbell |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Buck, Lanane, Zay and Niemeyer |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Koch and Taylor G |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Concurrence withdrawn |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2019-04-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 392: yeas 93, nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-03-28 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Government and Regulatory Reform |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senators Niemeyer and Kruse added as coauthors |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Zay added as third author |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Buck) prevailed; voice vote |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senator Buck added as second author |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2019-01-03 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2019-01-03 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |