IN SB0236 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 148: yeas 19, nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-02-04 - Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 148: yeas 19, nays 30
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
THC. Establishes a defense to operating with a controlled substance in the person's body if the substance is THC and the sample was taken under certain circumstances.
Title
THC.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 19 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: defeated; Roll Call 148: yeas 19, nays 30 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as third author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Freeman added as second author |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Corrections and Criminal Law |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Young M |