IN SB0238 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 9
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Various human services matters. Removes obsolete references to Larue D. Carter Memorial Hospital. Amends the definition of "early intervention services" to include additional services and qualified personnel for purposes of the infants and toddlers with disabilities program. Requires child care ministries to have at least one individual who maintains a CPR certification present at all times that a child is in the care of the child care ministry and requires employees and volunteers who are caregivers to maintain current first aid certification.
Title
Various human services matters.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 9 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 197: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 119: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |