IN SB0243 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - Senator Walker added as second author
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 6 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-01-24 - Senator Walker added as second author
Pending: Senate Pensions and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
From July 1, 2011, to June 30, 2015, exempts contractors awarded construction contracts by school corporations from the requirement of paying laborers at least the common construction wage.
Title
Common construction wage on school projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-01-24 | Senator Walker added as second author | |
2011-01-06 | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor | |
2011-01-06 | Authored by Senator Kruse |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.in.gov/apps/lsa/session/billwatch/billinfo?year=2011&session=1&request=getBill&doctype=SB&docno=0243 |
Text | http://www.in.gov/legislative/bills/2011/IN/IN0243.1.html |