IN SB0243 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-20 - Representative Eberhart added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 1 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-20 - Representative Eberhart added as cosponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals the law that prohibits the possession or use of a silencer while in the act of hunting. Provides that a person who takes or possesses a deer or wild turkey: (1) unlawfully; (2) by illegal methods; or (3) with illegal devices; while using or possessing a silencer commits a Class C misdemeanor. Makes hunting on private land without the permission of the owner a Class B misdemeanor if the person does so while using a silencer. Makes a technical correction.
Title
Silencers when hunting.
Sponsors
Sen. James Banks [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Randall Head [R] | Sen. Travis Holdman [R] |
Sen. James Tomes [R] | Sen. John Waterman [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-02-01 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 42 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-20 | Representative Eberhart added as cosponsor | |
2012-02-20 | Representative Rhoads removed as cosponsor | |
2012-02-09 | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Policy | |
2012-02-01 | Senator Tomes added as coauthor | |
2012-02-01 | Cosponsors: Reps. Ubelhor, Goodin and Rhoads | |
2012-02-01 | House sponsor: Rep. Davisson | |
2012-02-01 | Referred to the House | |
2012-02-01 | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 42 and nays 8 | |
2012-01-31 | Amendment 6 (Head), prevailed; voice vote | |
2012-01-31 | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed | |
2012-01-26 | Committee report: do pass, adopted | |
2012-01-25 | Senator Head added as coauthor | |
2012-01-23 | Senator Banks added as coauthor | |
2012-01-04 | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary | |
2012-01-04 | Authored by Senators Grooms, Holdman and Waterman |