IN SB0243 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-13 - Public Law 184
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Public records.
Title
Public records.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - House - House - Third reading: passed (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-11 - Senate - Senate - Third reading: passed (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-13 | House | Public Law 184 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2013-04-10 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2013-04-10 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 450: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | Representative Frye added as cosponsor |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-04-02 | House | Representative Forestal added as cosponsor |
2013-04-01 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Local Government |
2013-02-11 | Senate | House sponsor: Rep. Soliday |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 91: yeas 47 and nays 1 |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2013-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security, Transportation and Veterans Affairs |
2013-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senators Wyss and Arnold |