IN SB0243 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Public Law 168
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Substance abuse programs. Subject to the approval of the Indiana commission to combat drug abuse (commission), establishes the physician medication assisted treatment training reimbursement pilot program (pilot program) to reimburse qualified physicians who undergo certain medication assisted treatment training, for the purpose of increasing the number of physicians in Indiana allowed under the federal Drug Addiction Treatment Act of 2000 to prescribe certain controlled substances to treat opioid dependency in settings other than an opioid treatment program. Establishes requirements for participation in the pilot program. Subject to the approval of the commission, establishes the maternal neonatal opioid addiction project (project)
Title
Substance abuse programs. Subject to the approval of the Indiana commission to combat drug abuse (commission), establishes the physician medication assisted treatment training reimbursement pilot program (pilot program) to reimburse qualified physicians who undergo certain medication assisted treatment training, for the purpose of increasing the number of physicians in Indiana allowed under the federal Drug Addiction Treatment Act of 2000 to prescribe certain controlled substances to treat opioid dependency in settings other than an opioid treatment program. Establishes requirements for participation in the pilot program. Subject to the approval of the commission, establishes the maternal neonatal opioid addiction project (project)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House Amendments (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Public Law 168 |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurred in House Amendments; Roll Call 434: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2017-03-29 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2017-03-28 | House | Representative Bacon added as cosponsor |
2017-03-28 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2017-03-28 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 333: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2017-03-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-03-23 | House | Representatives Zent, Shackleford, Brown, C. added as cosponsors |
2017-03-23 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-28 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2017-02-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 153: yeas 46, nays 1 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Head added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as third author |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senator Merritt removed as third author |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Crider added as author |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senator Merritt removed as author |
2017-01-24 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as second author |
2017-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2017-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |