IN SB0243 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on March 4 2020 - 75% progression
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Physicians who leave an employer. Provides that a physician noncompete agreement, to be enforceable, must contain the following provisions: (1) A provision requiring the physician's employer to provide the physician with a copy of any notice that: (A) concerns the physician's departure; and (B) was sent to a patient seen or treated by the physician during the two years preceding the termination of the physician's employment or expiration of the departing physician's contract. (2) A provision requiring the physician's employer to provide current or last known contact and location information to a patient seen or treated by the physician during the two years preceding the termination of the physician's employment or expiration of the physician's contract. (3) A provision providing the physician whose employment has terminated or whose contract has expired with the option to purchase a complete and final release from the terms of an enforceable noncompete agreement at a reasonable price. (4) A provision prohibiting the providing of medical records to the physician in a format differing from the format used to create or store the medical record during the ordinary course of business. Provides for information and notification that an employer must give to: (1) a physician who leaves the employment of the provider; and (2) certain patients who request the physician's contact information. Allows a person or entity responsible for copying or transferring a medical record to charge a reasonable fee.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Physicians who leave an employer.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-05SenateSenate advisors appointed: Charbonneau and Breaux
2020-03-05SenateSenate conferees appointed: Brown L and Mrvan
2020-03-04HouseHouse advisors appointed: Morris, Lehman, Campbell and Fleming
2020-03-04HouseHouse conferees appointed: Carbaugh and Austin
2020-03-04SenateSenate dissented from House amendments
2020-03-04SenateMotion to dissent filed
2020-03-04HouseReturned to the Senate with amendments
2020-03-03HouseThird reading: passed; Roll Call 288: yeas 96, nays 0
2020-03-02HouseAmendment #1 (Judy) prevailed; voice vote
2020-03-02HouseSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-02-27HouseCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-02-11HouseReassigned to Committee on Insurance
2020-02-10HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Public Health
2020-02-05SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-04SenateCosponsors: Representatives Morris and Schaibley
2020-02-04SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Lehman
2020-02-04SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 150: yeas 49, nays 0
2020-02-03SenateAmendment #1 (Brown L) prevailed; voice vote
2020-02-03SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-30SenateSenator Charbonneau added as second author
2020-01-30SenateCommittee report: amend do pass, adopted
2020-01-09SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services
2020-01-09SenateAuthored by Senator Brown L

Indiana State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/243/
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/7/4/a/d/74ada6fa/SB0243.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/d/1/7/2/d172f49a/SB0243.01.INTR.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/e/8/0/be80640b/SB0243.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/7/8/9/4789b4f2/SB0243.02.COMS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/2/4/3/4243e3e8/SB0243.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/2/b/532b5390/SB0243.03.ENGS.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/c/5/1/d/c51d462e/SB0243.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/4/a/4/f/4a4ff520/SB0243.04.COMH.pdf
Texthttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/1/b/7/91b7ffef/SB0243.05.ENGH.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/1/5/b/b15b95b8/SB0243.01.INTR.05.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/0/1/c/4/01c4dd22/SB0243.150_S.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/5/3/2/f/532f9704/SB0243.03.ENGS.01.pdf
Roll Callhttp://iga.in.gov/static-documents/b/0/3/f/b03fee47/SB0243.288_H.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback