IN SB0246 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 69
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health services. Requires a school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school to certify to the department of homeland security that the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school has a memorandum of understanding in place with a community mental health center or provider certified or licensed by the state to provide mental and behavioral health services to students before applying for a grant from the Indiana secured school fund. Provides that the community mental health center or provider may be employed by the school corporation, charter school, or accredited nonpublic school. Requires a school corporation and a charter school to enter into a memorandum of understanding with a community mental health center or provider certified or licensed by the state to provide mental and behavioral health services to students. Requires the division of mental health and addiction to develop a memorandum of understanding for referral and assist school corporations and charter schools in obtaining a memorandum of understanding with a community mental health center or an appropriate provider. Requires each school corporation and charter school that enters into a memorandum of understanding with a community mental health center or appropriate provider to comply with certain confidentiality and referral requirements.
Title
Mental health services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Austin) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 83 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Austin) prevailed (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-14 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 69 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 350: yeas 83, nays 2 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 358: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Schaibley, Sherman, Hatfield and Shackleford |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Cook and Austin |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Merritt, Randolph Lonnie M, Becker and Ford J.D. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Crider and Mrvan |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 188: yeas 95, nays 2 |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Hatfield added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Amendment #1 (Austin) prevailed; Roll Call 179: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-13 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Schaibley added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Mrvan added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as second author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Cook |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 32: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Crider) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |