IN SB0254 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-5)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 137
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Water and wastewater utilities. Amends the law allowing the adjustment of a water or wastewater utility's rates and charges to enable the utility to recover the cost of eligible infrastructure improvements, by providing that the general maximum limit on the revenues used in determining the adjustment does not apply to infrastructure improvement costs associated with the construction, reconstruction, or improvement of a highway, street, or road. Amends the law that allows a public water utility to treat the costs of replacing customer-owned lead service lines as eligible infrastructure improvements for which a utility's rates and charges may be adjusted, by providing that the law applies to municipally owned utilities as well as public utilities. Establishes a procedure under which a public utility, municipally owned utility, or not-for-profit utility that provides water or wastewater service to the public and is under the jurisdiction of the commission for the approval of rates and charges may seek to recover, through a periodic rate adjustment, the cost of certain utility plant or equipment expenditures that are related to compliance with environmental requirements or made for health, safety, or environmental protection purposes.
Title
Water and wastewater utilities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-01-16 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 137 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-03 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-03-02 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 236: yeas 87, nays 0 |
2020-02-27 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-24 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Sherman D added as cosponsor |
2020-02-20 | House | Representative Hatfield added as cosponsor |
2020-02-13 | House | Representative Manning added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities, Energy and Telecommunications |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Soliday |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 47: yeas 45, nays 1 |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senators Ford J.D. and Randolph added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Utilities |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senators Charbonneau, Koch, Glick |