IN SB0255 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Insulin drugs. Repeals a provision that requires an individual to possess a prescription to purchase an insulin drug.
Title
Insulin drugs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 88 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 10 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-20 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-20 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 192: yeas 88, nays 0 |
2020-02-18 | House | Amendment #1 (Shackleford) ruled out of order |
2020-02-18 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Hatfield added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Shackleford added as cosponsor |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Vermilion A added as cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Kirchhofer removed as cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Kirchhofer added as sponsor |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Vermilion A removed as sponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Tomes added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Vermilion |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 79: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Melton added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as third author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Charbonneau |