IN SB0256 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 14-4)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 138
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Courts and judicial officers. Provides that the interim study committee on courts and the judiciary (committee) shall review, consider, and make recommendations concerning requests for new courts, new judicial officers, and changes in jurisdiction of existing courts in each even-numbered year. Specifies the information that must be provided to the committee with such a request. Provides that in each even-numbered year the committee shall: (1) identify each county in which the number of courts or judicial officers exceeds the number used by the county for a particular year; and (2) determine the number of years in which the number of courts or judicial officers in the county has exceeded the number used by the county. Requires the office of judicial administration to post the required information on its Internet web site. Establishes the Clark circuit courts No. 5 and No. 6, beginning January 1, 2025. Provides for the election of the judges of each of these circuit courts at the November 2024 general election. Establishes the Clark superior courts No. 5 and No. 6. Requires the governor to appoint the judge of each of these superior courts. Provides that each of these superior courts converts to Clark circuit courts No. 5 and No. 6 beginning January 1, 2025. Establishes a sixth circuit court in Delaware County. Removes the requirement that Delaware circuit courts No. 4 and No. 5 each have a standard small claims and misdemeanor docket. Establishes a third superior court in Marshall County. Allows the judges of the Gibson superior court and Gibson circuit court to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Gibson County courts. Allows the judges of the Hamilton circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint an additional magistrate to serve the Hamilton County courts. Allows the judges of the Jennings circuit and superior courts to jointly appoint a magistrate to serve the Jennings County courts. Requires the Indiana criminal justice institute to: (1) collect data concerning rates of rearrest of defendants released with and without money bail; and (2) submit an annual report containing the information collected to the legislative council. Urges the legislative council to assign to the committee the topic of giving mutual full faith and credit to judgments and orders of a tribal court of a federally recognized Indian tribe.
Title
Courts and judicial officers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Floor - (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Floor - (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed (Y: 18 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-15 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 138 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-10 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 363: yeas 66, nays 28 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 362: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Garten, Lanane and Mishler |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Koch and Taylor G |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Hostettler, Mayfield, Engleman, Steuerwald and Klinker |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: McNamara and DeLaney |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 283: yeas 91, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Representative Jordan added as cosponsor |
2020-02-27 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2020-02-27 | House | Representative Klinker added as cosponsor |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-20 | House | Referred to the Ways and Means pursuant to House Rule 127 |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Courts and Criminal Code |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Steuerwald and Torr |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative McNamara |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 80: yeas 47, nays 3 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Taylor G) failed; Roll Call 50: yeas 18, nays 32 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senators Garten, Ruckelshaus, Perfect, Spartz, Ford J.D. added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Merritt added as third author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Mishler added as second author |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Judiciary |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |