IN SB0257 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 71
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Aviation safety. Provides that INDOT shall not issue a permit for construction or alteration of an energy facility that will result in a structure that is more than 200 feet above ground level at its site unless the applicant for the permit submits to INDOT documentation of a formal review by the Clearinghouse of the proposed construction or alteration indicating: (1) that the formal review resulted in a determination that the construction or alteration will not have an adverse impact on military operations and readiness; or (2) that: (A) the formal review resulted in a determination that the proposed project will have an adverse impact on military operations and readiness; and (B) the applicant has either resolved the adverse impact to the satisfaction of the United States Department of Defense or entered into a mitigation agreement with the United States Department of Defense to mitigate the adverse impact. Provides that a person that is a public use airport owner or operator has standing to obtain judicial review or to intervene in a proceeding for judicial review of a zoning decision that may have a negative impact on the safety of civilian or military flight operations to or from the airport.
Title
Aviation safety.
Sponsors
Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Chris Garten [R] | Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] |
Rep. Edmond Soliday [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] | Rep. Randall Frye [R] |
Rep. Mara Reardon [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 71 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 339: yeas 41, nays 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Representatives Pressel, Frye, Candelaria Reardon added as cosponsors |
2020-03-03 | House | Rule 105.1 suspended |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 280: yeas 80, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-18 | House | Representative Lehman added as cosponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Roads and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Soliday |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 62: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as third author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Garten added as second author |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Homeland Security and Transportation |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Koch |