IN SB0266 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - First reading: referred to Committee on Education
Pending: House Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Teacher training. Requires the department of education to do the following: (1) Evaluate teacher training requirements in Indiana. (2) Prepare a report that includes recommendations for: (A) streamlining, combining, and reducing, as applicable, the teacher training requirements in Indiana; (B) the possibility of including teacher training requirements in teacher preparation programs; and (C) requiring, as appropriate, the completion of teacher training requirements in conjunction with the renewal of teacher licenses. (3) Not later than October 1, 2020, submit the report to the general assembly.
Title
Teacher training.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Education |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Bassler added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Jordan |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 81: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Glick added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senators Rogers, Crane, Kruse, Buchanan added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Education and Career Development |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Donato |