IN SB0269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-21 - Public Law 139
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Worker's compensation. Provides that for worker's compensation and occupational diseases compensation, not later than 14 days from the date that the first installment of compensation is due, an employer or the employer's insurance carrier must file with the worker's compensation board (board) a report of payment of compensation. (Current law provides that not later than 15 days from the date that the first installment of compensation is due, an employer or the employer's insurance carrier must file with the worker's compensation board a compensation agreement.) Provides that for worker's compensation and occupational diseases compensation, the presentation to the employee or to the employee's dependents of certain payments from the employer or the employer's insurance carrier is sufficient tender of the worker's compensation or occupational diseases compensation. Provides that for worker's compensation and occupational diseases coverage, an employer must notify certain employees of the employer's intent to terminate the employee's temporary total disability benefits, and for all instances of termination of benefits, file an electronic notice with the board. (Current law provides that an employer must notify an employee of the employer's intent to terminate temporary total disability benefits in cases not included in statute.) Provides that for worker's compensation and occupational diseases compensation for injuries occurring on or after July 1, 1991, compensation amounts determined for visual impairments shall be: (1) based on the Functional Vision Score; and (2) except in cases of permanent and complete loss of vision by enucleation, be paid as a whole person rating. (Current law provides that for injuries occurring on or after July 1, 1991, compensation amounts determined for: (1) permanent reduction of the sight of an eye less than a total eye loss shall be paid in an amount proportionate to the degree of a permanent reduction without correction or glasses; and (2) 100% loss of vision shall be paid for 50% of the total loss of vision without glasses, plus an additional amount equal to the proportionate amount of the reduction with glasses.) Removes from the compensation schedule for worker's compensation and occupational diseases compensation, for injuries occurring on or after July 1, 1991, that a reduction of vision to 1/10 of normal vision with glasses is 35 degrees of permanent impairment. Provides that the board may dispose of all papers for files when compensation has been awarded either by agreement or upon hearing two years after the termination of the compensation period for files related to worker's compensation and worker's occupational diseases compensation. (Current law provides for one year.) Provides that all records of insurance coverage related to worker's occupational diseases compensation shall be maintained for 35 years. (Current law provides the records be maintained for 45 years.)
Title
Worker's compensation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Philip Boots [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] |
Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Heath VanNatter [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-24 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-21 | Senate | Public Law 139 |
2020-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-05 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-25 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-24 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 199: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-20 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-18 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as third author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Boots added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative VanNatter |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 82: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |