IN SB0272 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 74
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana economic development corporation. Provides that the secretary of commerce or the secretary's designee is a member of the Indiana defense task force and a member of the governor's workforce cabinet. Abolishes the Indiana office of defense development. Provides that if the governor is unable to chair a meeting of the Indiana economic development corporation board, the governor may designate a board member as acting chairperson. Provides that the secretary of commerce or the secretary's designee has certain duties currently assigned to the president of the Indiana economic development corporation to sign warrants drawn by the auditor of state. Provides that the term "taxpayer" includes an assignee as opposed to a lessee for purposes of the industrial recovery tax credit. Revises the terms for assigning an industrial recovery tax credit. Eliminates the tax credit for fostering of employment of students who participate in a course of study that includes a cooperative arrangement between an educational institution and an employer. Makes conforming changes for the elimination of the tax credit. (Under current law, the tax credit applied to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2014, and before January 1, 2019.)
Title
Indiana economic development corporation.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Mark Messmer [R] | Sen. Ronald Grooms [R] | Rep. Gerald Torr [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Appeal the ruling of the chair (Pryor) (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Chyung) failed (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Appeal the ruling of the chair (Pryor) (Y: 63 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Chyung) failed (Y: 30 N: 63 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 74 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 340: yeas 41, nays 0 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 289: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Appeal the ruling of the chair (Pryor); ruling of the chair sustained Roll Call 251: yeas 63, nays 30 |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #3 (Pryor) ruled out of order |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Chyung) failed; Roll Call 250: yeas 30, nays 63 |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #2 (Pryor) ruled out of order |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #6 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-30 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Torr |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 101: yeas 48, nays 0 |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as third author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Messmer added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford Jon |