IN SB0273 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 75
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Indiana behavioral health commission. Establishes the Indiana behavioral health commission (commission). Specifies the membership of the commission. Requires the commission to prepare: (1) an interim report not later than October 1, 2020; and (2) a final report not later than October 1, 2022. Specifies the issues and topics to be discussed in the commission reports. Requires commission reports to be issued to the following parties: (1) The governor. (2) The legislative council. (3) Any other party specified by the commission chairperson. Requires commission reports to be issued in an electronic format. Abolishes the commission on December 31, 2022. Defines certain terms. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Indiana behavioral health commission.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 75 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 330: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 189: yeas 92, nays 3 |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Hatfield added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Cherry |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 155: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senators Becker and Grooms added as coauthors |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ruckelshaus added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Crider |