IN SB0283 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State payments in lieu of property taxes. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the topic of state payments in lieu of property taxes to counties in which at least 15% of all land in the county is: (1) in the aggregate, owned or leased by the state of Indiana or the federal government; and (2) subject to an exemption from property taxes.
Title
State payments in lieu of property taxes. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying the topic of state payments in lieu of property taxes to counties in which at least 15% of all land in the county is: (1) in the aggregate, owned or leased by the state of Indiana or the federal government; and (2) subject to an exemption from property taxes.
Sponsors
Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. Jeff Raatz [R] | Sen. Eric Koch [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] |
Sen. James Buck [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Rep. Steve Bartels [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - Senate - Third reading (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senator Zay added as coauthor |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2019-02-26 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Bartels |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 224: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as second author |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2019-01-07 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Appropriations |
2019-01-07 | Senate | Authored by Senator Houchin |