IN SB0288 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Anatomical gift through hunting, fishing or trapping license. Allows an individual to make an anatomical gift with a resident hunting, fishing, or trapping license. Requires the department to place an identifying symbol on the face of the resident license to hunt, fish, or trap that is issued to the individual. Requires the department of natural resources to adopt rules. Provides that revocation, suspension, expiration, or cancellation of the donor's license does not invalidate the anatomical gift. Provides that neither the state nor a organ recovery health care provider is civilly liable as a result of an individual making an unrevoked anatomical gift. Makes conforming changes.
Title
Anatomical gift through hunting, fishing or trapping license.
Sponsors
Sen. Blake Doriot [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Ronald Bacon [R] |
Rep. Sean Eberhart [R] | Rep. Dale DeVon [R] | Rep. Rita Fleming [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 11 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Representative Fleming added as cosponsor |
2020-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 212: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative DeVon added as cosponsor |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative Bacon added as sponsor |
2020-02-11 | House | Representative DeVon removed as sponsor |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Eberhart |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative DeVon |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 122: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Zay added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Natural Resources |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Doriot |