IN SB0290 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-25 - Public Law 204
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Worker's compensation. Establishes a time frame for the payment of compensation under a settlement agreement, a permanent partial impairment agreement, and an award of compensation ordered by a single hearing member of the worker's compensation board (board). Provides that an employer that fails to make a timely payment is subject to a civil penalty. Requires an employer that has mobile or remote employees to convey information about worker's compensation coverage to the employer's employees in an electronic format or in the same manner as the employer conveys other employment related information. Allows the electronic filing of certain documents with the
Title
Worker's compensation. Establishes a time frame for the payment of compensation under a settlement agreement, a permanent partial impairment agreement, and an award of compensation ordered by a single hearing member of the worker's compensation board (board). Provides that an employer that fails to make a timely payment is subject to a civil penalty. Requires an employer that has mobile or remote employees to convey information about worker's compensation coverage to the employer's employees in an electronic format or in the same manner as the employer conveys other employment related information. Allows the electronic filing of certain documents with the
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Ford [R] | Sen. Karen Tallian [D] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Sen. David Niezgodski [D] |
Sen. Dennis Kruse [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] | Rep. Charles Moseley [D] | Rep. Jim Pressel [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Senate concurred in House amendments (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-19 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-02-13 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2018-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-17 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-25 | Senate | Public Law 204 |
2018-03-25 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2018-03-21 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2018-03-13 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2018-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Senate concurred in House amendments; Roll Call 346: yeas 49, nays 0 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to concur filed |
2018-02-20 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Pressel added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | House | Representative Moseley added as cosponsor |
2018-02-19 | House | Amendment #1 (Lehman) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-02-19 | House | Third reading: recommitted to Committee of One, amendment adopted; bill passed; Roll Call 183: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2018-02-15 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2018-02-13 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2018-02-06 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Employment, Labor and Pensions |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2018-01-29 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 84: yeas 47, nays 2 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Tallian) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford) prevailed; voice vote |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as third author |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as second author |
2018-01-22 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as coauthor |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2018-01-04 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Pensions and Labor |
2018-01-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ford |