IN SB0292 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
County option circuit breaker tax credit. Authorizes a county fiscal body to adopt an ordinance to provide a credit against property tax liability for qualified individuals. Defines a "qualified individual" for purposes of the credit. Provides that the ordinance may designate: (1) all of the territory of the county; or (2) one or more specific geographic territories within the county; as an area in which qualified individuals may apply for the credit. Provides that the credit amount is equal to the amount by which property taxes on the property increased by more than 2% from the prior year. Requires a qualified individual who desires to claim the credit to file a certified statement with the county auditor. Provides that the county auditor shall apply the credit in succeeding years after the certified statement is filed unless the auditor determines that the individual is no longer eligible for the credit or the county fiscal body rescinds the ordinance. Provides a penalty for wrongly receiving the credit that is the same as the penalty for wrongly receiving the homestead standard deduction.
Title
County option circuit breaker tax credit.
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Sandlin [R] | Sen. Brian Buchanan [R] | Sen. Mike Gaskill [R] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Rep. Ethan Manning [R] | Rep. Cherrish Pryor [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 39 N: 8 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Manning and Pryor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 123: yeas 39, nays 8 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Gaskill added as third author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Buchanan added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sandlin |