IN SB0294 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Senator Becker added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Senator Becker added as coauthor
Pending: Senate Health and Provider Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Direct support professional registry. Requires the state department of health (department) to establish a direct support professional registry (registry). Requires an authorized service provider that hires a direct support professional to submit certain information regarding the direct support professional to the department for inclusion in the registry, and requires the authorized service provider to submit updated information to the department when the direct support professional separates from employment with the authorized service provider. Requires the department to adopt rules to implement the registry, including rules to limit access to the registry to only authorized service providers. Provides that the registry must be operational not later than January 1, 2021.
Title
Direct support professional registry.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as second author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Charbonneau added as third author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ruckelshaus |
Indiana State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://iga.in.gov/legislative/2020/bills/senate/294/details |
Text | http://iga.in.gov/static-documents/9/3/a/5/93a5504f/SB0294.01.INTR.pdf |