IN SB0299 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 13-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 77
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Fetal remains. Requires the state department of health (state department) to develop forms that provide: (1) that a pregnant woman has a right after a surgical abortion to dispose of the remains by interment or cremation or have the provider dispose of the remains; and (2) that, after an abortion induced by an abortion inducing drug, the pregnant woman will expel an aborted fetus and set forth the disposition policy of the health care facility or abortion clinic concerning the disposition of the aborted fetus, including allowing a pregnant woman to return an aborted fetus to the health care facility or abortion clinic for disposition by interment or cremation. States that a pregnant woman who has an abortion has the right to have the health care facility or abortion clinic dispose of the aborted fetus by cremation or interment and to ask the health care facility or abortion clinic the method of disposition used. Requires the pregnant woman to inform the health care facility or abortion clinic of the pregnant woman's decision for disposition or, in the case of an abortion induced by an abortion inducing drug, whether the pregnant woman will return the aborted fetus to the health care facility or abortion clinic for disposition. Requires the health care facility or abortion clinic to dispose of the returned fetus by cremation or interment. Requires that a burial transit permit that includes multiple aborted fetal remains be accompanied by a log prescribed by the state department containing certain information, except in certain circumstances, about each fetus included under the burial transit permit.
Title
Fetal remains.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 81 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 39 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 78 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 40 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 77 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 369: yeas 81, nays 15 |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 363: yeas 39, nays 10 |
2020-03-10 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Bacon added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Errington removed as conferee |
2020-03-10 | House | Representative Bacon removed as advisor |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as conferee |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Senator Breaux removed as conferee |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Bacon, Lehman, Fleming, Porter and Shackleford |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Stutzman and Errington |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Rogers, Tallian, Zay and Ford J.D. |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Brown L and Breaux |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-02-28 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-02-27 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 220: yeas 78, nays 13 |
2020-02-24 | House | Amendment #1 (Bacon) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-02-24 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Public Health |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senator Raatz added as coauthor |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Bacon, Mayfield, Morris |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Stutzman |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 159: yeas 40, nays 9 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Spartz added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Breaux) failed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Breaux) failed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Breaux) failed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Crane added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Zay added as third author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Rogers added as second author |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown L |