IN SB0307 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 10-2)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
National guard life insurance program. Requires the adjutant general of the Indiana national guard to facilitate the state sponsored group term life insurance program for members of the Indiana national guard.
Title
National guard life insurance program.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-17 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 12 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-18 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-17 | House | Representative Goodin added as cosponsor |
2020-02-17 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 180: yeas 96, nays 0 |
2020-02-13 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-11 | House | Representatives Judy and Goodrich added as cosponsors |
2020-02-11 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and Public Safety |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senators Glick and Taylor G added as coauthors |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Buck added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Kruse added as coauthor |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Niemeyer added as third author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Crider added as second author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Frye R |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 63: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Doriot added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-09 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Veterans Affairs and The Military |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Authored by Senator Tomes |