IN SB0312 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
Pending: House Family, Children and Human Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs
Pending: House Family, Children and Human Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Parents with a disability. Specifies that it is the policy of the state to recognize the importance of family and children, including the parenting rights of a parent, regardless of whether the parent has a disability. Provides that the right of a person with a disability to parent the person's child may not be denied or restricted solely because the person has a disability. Establishes procedures to be used in proceedings concerning: (1) custody; (2) parenting time; (3) adoption; (4) foster care; and (5) guardianship; when a parent, prospective parent, prospective foster parent, or prospective guardian is a person with a disability. Requires the department of child services to implement disability awareness training. Provides for the expungement of information relating to the unlawful removal of a child from the home of a person with a disability. Makes conforming amendments.
Title
Parents with a disability.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Family, Children and Human Affairs |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Koch added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Clere, Porter, Wright |
2020-02-03 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Ziemke |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 124: yeas 47, nays 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as second author |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon removed as coauthor |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senators Donato and Houchin added as coauthors |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niezgodski |