IN SB0337 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - Reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Various insurance and health care matters. Requires the state personnel department to: (1) evaluate whether to offer state employees a health reimbursement arrangement benefit and consider the population of state employees to whom the benefit should be offered; and (2) report to the general assembly on the department's findings by November 1, 2020. Requires the office of the secretary of family and social services to study the feasibility of: (1) changing Indiana's Medicaid program to a block grant; (2) establishing a consumer-directed Medicaid pilot program; and (3) restructuring Medicaid payments for long term care. Requires a nonprofit hospital that deducts an amount for charity care that exceeds the Medicare reimbursement rate for the services to disclose in its annual report to the state department of health a breakdown of the components of the deduction that were taken by the nonprofit hospital in determining net patient revenue. Establishes limitations on covenants not to compete concerning physicians. Requires specified licensing boards to submit information and recommendations on various licensure matters. Allows a party to audit a pharmacy benefit manager with which it has a contract. Requires the department of insurance (department) to take certain action on association health plans in compliance with federal law. Sets forth requirements of short term insurance plans and insurers that issue these plans. Requires the department to examine various integration opportunities. Urges the legislative council to assign various topics for study during the 2020 legislative interim. Requires the department to assess the feasibility of allowing the sale of health insurance across state lines and a multistate reciprocity system. Requires specified agencies to report on Medicaid claim auditing and fraud. Requires the department and the secretary of family and social services to develop a framework for long term care insurance policies and sets requirements. Requires the attorney general to make recommendations on enhancing strict antitrust enforcement of anticompetitive practices. Requires the commission on higher education to provide an executive summary on medical training programs. Requires the department of workforce development to provide an executive summary on health worker supply needs. Requires the medical licensing board of Indiana to provide an executive summary concerning the creation and implementation of expedited licensure pathways. Requires the trustee of the net level Indiana trust fund to report on trust assets in health care related infrastructure. Requires the Indiana economic development corporation to provide a report concerning incentive programs related to health care infrastructure. Requires the department and the office of the secretary of family and social services to assess the feasibility of applying for federal 1332 waivers concerning the insurance market.
Title
Various insurance and health care matters.
Sponsors
Sen. Victoria Spartz [R] | Sen. Andy Zay [R] | Sen. Mike Bohacek [R] | Rep. Matthew Lehman [R] |
Rep. Donna Schaibley [R] | Rep. Martin Carbaugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 43 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed (Y: 15 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | Reassigned to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Schaibley and Carbaugh |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Lehman |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 167: yeas 43, nays 6 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #3 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Ford J.D.) failed; voice vote |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #1 (Ford J.D.) failed; Roll Call 105: yeas 15, nays 34 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as third author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Zay added as second author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Insurance and Financial Institutions |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Spartz |