IN SB0342 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Pregnancy accommodation. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee the task of studying pregnancy and childbirth accommodations and the fiscal impact on businesses within Indiana.
Title
Pregnancy accommodation.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 41 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Zay) prevailed (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Amendment #2 (Zay) prevailed (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Cosponsors: Representatives Engleman, Klinker, Negele |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Kirchhofer |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 168: yeas 41, nays 8 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senator Breaux added as coauthor |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Amendment #2 (Zay) prevailed; Roll Call 106: yeas 34, nays 15 |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senator Stoops added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Tallian added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Lanane added as coauthor |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senators Donato, Melton, Taylor G added as coauthors |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Walker added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Ford Jon added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Crider added as coauthor |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senator Becker added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Senator Grooms added as third author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Senator Bohacek added as second author |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Family and Children Services |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Alting |