IN SB0350 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-18 - Public Law 83
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Central Indiana regional development authority. Authorizes counties and municipalities within the Indianapolis metropolitan area to establish a central Indiana regional development authority pilot that will sunset on July 1, 2025. Requires counties and municipalities that wish to establish the development authority to adopt substantially similar resolutions to adopt a preliminary strategic economic development plan (preliminary development plan). Provides that the development authority shall be governed by a strategy committee composed of members selected according to the terms of the preliminary development plan adopted to establish the development authority. Specifies the duties of the development authority. Requires the development authority to prepare a comprehensive strategic economic development plan. Codifies the establishment and governing provisions of the Indianapolis metropolitan planning organization. Requires the Indianapolis metropolitan planning organization to: (1) develop a comprehensive asset management report for the metropolitan planning area in collaboration with the Indiana department of transportation; and (2) present the comprehensive asset management report to the city-county council of Indianapolis and Marion County, the fiscal and legislative bodies of each entity that is a member of the Indianapolis metropolitan planning organization, and the budget committee.
Title
Central Indiana regional development authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Travis Holdman [R] | Sen. Erin Houchin [R] | Sen. J.D. Ford [D] | Rep. Timothy Brown [R] |
Rep. Gregory Porter [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 34 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 31 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House - Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1 (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House - Amendment #1 (Porter) failed (Y: 31 N: 61 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [FAIL]
2020-02-26 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 48 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-18 | Senate | Public Law 83 |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-18 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-16 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-03-11 | House | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the House; Roll Call 374: yeas 80, nays 0 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Rules Suspended. Conference Committee Report 1: adopted by the Senate; Roll Call 385: yeas 34, nays 15 |
2020-03-11 | House | CCR # 1 filed in the House |
2020-03-10 | Senate | CCR # 1 filed in the Senate |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate advisors appointed: Houchin and Taylor G |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate conferees appointed: Holdman and Ford J.D. |
2020-03-04 | House | House advisors appointed: Barrett, Jordan, Schaibley, DeLaney, Hamilton and Pryor |
2020-03-04 | House | House conferees appointed: Brown T and Porter |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate dissented from House amendments |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Motion to dissent filed |
2020-03-04 | House | Returned to the Senate with amendments |
2020-03-03 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 292: yeas 94, nays 0 |
2020-03-02 | House | Representative Porter added as cosponsor |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #1 (Porter) failed; Roll Call 252: yeas 31, nays 61 |
2020-03-02 | House | Amendment #2 (Brown T) prevailed; voice vote |
2020-03-02 | House | Second reading: amended, ordered engrossed |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-02-11 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-02-04 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Brown T |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 171: yeas 48, nays 1 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Ford J.D. added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Houchin added as second author |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Holdman |