IN SB0353 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-30 - Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibition on risk based managed care programs. Extends the prohibition against the inclusion of certain Medicaid recipients in: (1) risk based managed care programs; or (2) capitated managed care programs; from June 30, 2020, to June 30, 2021. Makes a technical correction.
Title
Prohibition on risk based managed care programs.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | Senate | Committee report: do pass adopted; reassigned to Committee on Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Health and Provider Services |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senators Becker and Charbonneau |