IN SB0358 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Public Law 32
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Business associations of real estate agents. Allows a broker company to pay compensation directly to a business entity owned by a licensed broker that has been formed for the purpose of receiving compensation earned by the broker.
Title
Business associations of real estate agents.
Sponsors
Sen. James Merritt [R] | Sen. Clyde Perfect [R] | Sen. Lonnie Randolph [D] | Rep. Ethan Manning [R] |
Rep. Edward Clere [R] | Rep. Charles Burton [R] | Rep. Carey Hamilton [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-28 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-23 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Public Law 32 |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-26 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 213: yeas 92, nays 0 |
2020-02-24 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-20 | House | Representatives Burton and Hamilton added as cosponsors |
2020-02-20 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Financial Institutions |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senator Randolph added as coauthor |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Clere |
2020-01-28 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Manning |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 88: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senator Perfect added as second author |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Commerce and Technology |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Merritt |