IN SB0366 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Public Law 13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Kankakee River and Yellow River development. Provides that the auditor of state shall deduct amounts due from distributions of local income taxes allocated to (as opposed to payable to) the county when a county fails to pay direct support or special assessments to the Kankakee River basin and Yellow River basin development commission.
Title
Kankakee River and Yellow River development.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-18 - House - House - Third reading (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - House - House - Committee Vote (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-21 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | Senate | Public Law 13 |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Signed by the Governor |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by the President of the Senate |
2020-03-03 | House | Signed by the Speaker |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Signed by the President Pro Tempore |
2020-02-19 | House | Returned to the Senate without amendments |
2020-02-18 | House | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 190: yeas 95, nays 0 |
2020-02-17 | House | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-02-13 | House | Committee report: do pass, adopted |
2020-02-10 | House | First reading: referred to Committee on Ways and Means |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Referred to the House |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Cosponsor: Representative Aylesworth |
2020-01-27 | Senate | House sponsor: Representative Gutwein |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Third reading: passed; Roll Call 64: yeas 50, nays 0 |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senator Niezgodski added as second author |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Second reading: ordered engrossed |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Committee report: amend do pass, adopted |
2020-01-13 | Senate | First reading: referred to Committee on Tax and Fiscal Policy |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Authored by Senator Niemeyer |