IN SB0368 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 4 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - First reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
Pending: House Rules and Legislative Procedures Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Study of carbon sequestration. Urges the legislative council to assign to an appropriate interim study committee for the 2020 interim the task of studying carbon sequestration through conservation of forest lands, reforestation, and carbon farming.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Study of carbon sequestration.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate - Third reading (Y: 38 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee Vote (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11HouseFirst reading: referred to Committee on Rules and Legislative Procedures
2020-02-04SenateReferred to the House
2020-02-03SenateCosponsors: Representatives Lehe and Pierce
2020-02-03SenateHouse sponsor: Representative Wolkins
2020-02-03SenateThird reading: passed; Roll Call 130: yeas 38, nays 9
2020-01-30SenateSenator Messmer added as coauthor
2020-01-30SenateAmendment #1 (Stoops) prevailed; voice vote
2020-01-30SenateSecond reading: amended, ordered engrossed
2020-01-27SenateSenator Ruckelshaus added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateSenator Bassler added as coauthor
2020-01-27SenateCommittee report: do pass, adopted
2020-01-23SenateSenator Leising added as third author
2020-01-23SenateSenator Glick added as second author
2020-01-13SenateFirst reading: referred to Committee on Environmental Affairs
2020-01-13SenateAuthored by Senator Stoops

Indiana State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback